## HOW TO MULTIPLY A NUMBER BY 11 USING VEDIC MATHS TRICKS

Let us discuss the shortcut and easy method of multiplication of any number however large with 11 in fraction of seconds. With the help of this method , we can multiply any number in just 2 - 3 seconds.

1 Place zero at right side of the multiplicand.

2 Keep on adding each digit of the multiplicand from extreme right to its neighbour till end , if any stage sum is obtained greater than 10 then carry of 1 will be added to next step.

##
- Examples

## 52324 × 11= ?

2 Now add 0 to its neighbour 4 as 0 + 4 = 4

3 Now add 4 to its neighbour 2 as 4 + 2 = 6

4 Now add 2 to its neighbour 3 as 2 + 3 = 5

5 Now add 3 to its neighbour 2 as 3 + 2 = 5

6 Now add 2 to its neighbour 5 as 2 + 5 = 7

7 Place left most digit as it is = 5

8 Write the digits so obtained ( blue coloured) from top to bottom as right to left

#### So Answer will be 5,75,564

##
- Examples

## 4543423 × 11= ?

1 Place zero at right end of the multiplicand like this 45434230

2 Now add 0 to its left neighbour 3 as 0 + 3 = 3

3 Now add 3 to its left neighbour 2 as 3 + 2 = 5

4 Now add 2 to its left neighbour 4 as 2 + 4 = 6

5 Now add 4 to its left neighbour 3 as 4 + 3 = 7

6 Now add 3 to its left neighbour 4 as 3 + 4 = 7

6 Now add 4 to its left neighbour 5 as 4+ 5 = 9

6 Now add 5 to its left neighbour 4 as 5 + 4 = 9

7 Place left most digit as it is = 4

8 Write the digits so obtained ( blue coloured) from top to bottom as right to left

### So Answer will be 4,99,77653

## 3598678 × 11= ?

1 Place zero at right end of the multiplicand like this 3598678

2 Now add 0 to its neighbour 8 as 0+8= 8

3 Now add 8 to its neighbour 7 as 8+7=15 write 5 and carry 1 to next step

4 Now add 7 to its neighbour 6 as 7+6=13+1 (carry)=14 write 4 and carry 1 to next step

5 Now add 6 to its neighbour 8 as 6+8 = 14+1(carry) = 15 write 5 and carry 1 to next step

6 Now add 8 to its neighbour 9 as 8+9=17+1(carry) =18 write 8 and carry 1 to next step

7 Now add 9 to its neighbour 5 as 9+5=14+1(carry) = 15 write 5 and carry 1 to next step

8 Now add 5 to its neighbour 3 as 5+3=8+1(carry) = 9

9 Place left most digit as it is = 3

11 Write the digits so obtained (Red coloured) from top to bottom as right to left

####
** So Answer will be 3,95,85458**

### 8923586 × 11 = ?

###

1 Place zero at right end of the multiplicand like this 89235860

2 Now add 0 to its neighbour 6 as 0+6 = 6

3 Now add 6 to its neighbour 8 as 6+8=14

write 4 and carry over 1 to next step

4 Now add 8 to its neighbour 5 as 8+5=13+1(carry) = 14

write 4 and carry over 1 to next step

5 Now add 5 to its neighbour 3 as 5+3=8+(1)carry= 9

6 Now add 3 to its neighbour 2 as 3 + 2 = 5

7 Now add 2 to its neighbour 9 as 2+9=11

write 1 and carry over 1 to next step

8 Now add 9 to its neighbour 8 as 9+8=17+(1)carry = 18

write 8 and carry over 1 to next step

9 Now add 1(carry ) to its neighbour 8 as 1+8 = 9

Write all the digits so obtained ( blue coloured) from top to bottom as right to left.

### So answer will be 98,159,446

##
**35681237 ×11 = ?**

1 Place right most digit 7 of multiplicand as right most digit of answer.

2 Keep on adding right sided digit to its left sided digit in pairwise.

3 If the sum at any time is found to be more than 10, then take "1" as carry over to next step every time.

4 Repeat the process till last digit.

so After 1st step we shall have 7

After 2nd step we shall have 7+3=10 =

**0**(right sided digit of 10 ) and 1 as carry to next step.
After 3rd step we shall have 3+2=5+1=

**6**and no number as carry to next step.
After 4th step we shall have 2+1=

**3**and no number as carry to next step.
Similarly we get 1+8=

**9**,
and 8 + 6 = 14 =

**4**as (right sided digit of 14 ) and 1 as carry to next step.
5 + 6 = 11 + 1 = 12 =

**2**(right sided digit of 12), and
3+8 = 8 + 1 =

And the last digit =

Now write all the highlighted digits from bottom to top .

**9;**And the last digit =

**3**Now write all the highlighted digits from bottom to top .

### So Answer will be 392493067

These are some of the examples demonstrated in the video given below

##
**Application of this Method**

## If we have to multiply 666854×55

## then rewrite given product as 666854×(11×5)

## Now multiply 666854×11 as follows

### Step 1

Place right most digit 4 as result and keep on adding the digits to its left one by one which gives 7335394, and

###
** Step 2**

Now place 0 as right most digit of this result i. e.73353940 ,

### Step 3

Now divide with 2 we get 36676970 and this is the Final answer.

## Example

Let us multiply 35987604 × 55

Rewrite 35987604 × (11×5)

Multiply 35987604 × 11 = 395863644

Now place "0" at extreme right of this number it become 3958636440 , Now divide this number with 2 to get the Answer 1979318220.

### Now Fast multiplication with one more Example

69852364639×55

### Step 1

1st multiply the given number with 11 by placing and adding digits from left to right 9,12,9,10,10,9,5,7,13,17,15,6 (if total greater than 10 ,carry 1 to next number) like this 9,2,0,1,1,0,6,7,3,8,6,7.

### Step 2

Write these numbers from left to right, place zero at end and divide by 2 to get the answer like this 7683760110290 → 384,188,005,5145.

## Conclusion

This shortcuts method was to multiply a number with 11 . Thanks for spending your precious time to read this post ,If you liked this post . Please share it with your friends and also follow me on my blog to encourage me to do better than best. See your in next post, till then Bye.....

## No comments:

## Post a Comment